Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Domingo Sarlinga

Bishop of Zárate-Campana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1963 BornBuenos Aires
30 Apr 199026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
12 Apr 200339.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
12 Apr 200339.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
17 May 200340.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
3 Feb 200642.7AppointedBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
18 Feb 200642.7InstalledBishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Oscar Domingo Sarlinga:
Bishop Oscar Domingo Sarlinga (born ) Bishop of Zárate-Campana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zárate-Campana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013