Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rubén Héctor di Monte

Archbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1932 BornLuján
5 Dec 195422.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 198048.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
13 Jun 198048.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
16 Aug 198048.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium
24 Mar 198653.9AppointedBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
1 May 198654.1InstalledBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
7 Mar 200067.9AppointedArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
26 Apr 200068.0InstalledArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
27 Dec 200775.7RetiredArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rubén Héctor di Monte:
Archbishop Rubén Héctor di Monte (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mercedes-Luján.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013