Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela

Archidioecesis Valentinus in Venetiola



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 November 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 3,921 (1,514 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 32, Av. Urdaneta 100-54, Valencia 2001-A, Edo. Carabobo, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0241)858.58.65, 858.94.49
  • Fax: 857.80.61

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela
12 October 1922ErectedArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela (erected)
7 October 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Barquisimeto
Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela
Diocese of San Felipe (erected)
16 May 1972Territory LostDiocese of Valencia en Venezuela Diocese of San Carlos de Venezuela (erected)
Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela
12 November 1974ElevatedDiocese of Valencia en Venezuela Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela
5 July 1994Territory LostArchdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela Diocese of Puerto Cabello (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela
19504063103034ap1951
1966445,065450,00098.9%53531064,1986613052ap1967
1970590,000593,39999.4%49571065,5666718654ap1971
Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela
1976700,000793,89288.2%42751175,982110620156ap1977
19801,000,0001,060,00094.3%39701099,174110420357ap1981
19901,490,0001,593,00093.5%517312412,016110318258ap1991
19991,615,0001,900,00085.0%546712113,34719214953ap2000
20001,657,5001,950,00085.0%526912113,69819114753ap2001
20011,767,5102,079,42485.0%515710816,36518515753ap2002
20021,850,0002,130,00086.9%526311516,08619015153ap2003
20031,610,0001,800,00089.4%546311713,76018017154ap2004
20041,650,0001,850,00089.2%565411015,00017116256ap2005
20101,893,0002,118,00089.4%676513214,34018315561ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014