Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Montes de Oca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valencia en Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1895BornCarora
20 Jun 192731.7AppointedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
23 Oct 192732.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
22 Dec 193439.2ResignedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
22 Dec 193439.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
1940²44.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Bilta
10 Sep 194448.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Valencia en Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Montes de Oca:
Bishop Salvador Montes de Oca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valencia en Venezuela

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1927, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013