Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aguedo Felipe Alvarado Liscano

Deceased

Bishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1845Born
18 Aug 187227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
6 Jul 191065.4SelectedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
16 Aug 191065.5ConfirmedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
6 Nov 191065.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
25 Sep 192681.6DiedBishop of Barquisimeto, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Aguedo Felipe Alvarado Liscano
Bishop Aguedo Felipe Alvarado Liscano (born , died ) Bishop of Barquisimeto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBobures

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast