Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Rincón González

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1861BornChiquinquirá
19 Sep 189635.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zulia, Venezuela
10 Aug 191655.4AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
28 Oct 191655.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
13 May 194685.2DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Felipe Rincón González:
Archbishop Felipe Rincón González (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015