Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Críspulo Uzcátegui

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1845Born
1872¹26.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 188439.4AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
22 Feb 188539.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
31 May 190459.0DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Críspulo Uzcátegui
Archbishop Críspulo Uzcátegui (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarora, Diocese of Barquisimeto
Ordained BishopCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017