Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Calabozo

Archidioecesis Calabocensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 June 1995
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 32,000 (12,360 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Carrera 4 entre carrera 11-12, Calabozo 2312, Edo. Guarico, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0246)871.04.83
  • Fax: 871.20.97

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Calabozo
7 March 1863ErectedArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Diocese of Mérida
Diocese of Calabozo (erected)
7 June 1954Territory LostDiocese of Barquisimeto
Diocese of Calabozo
Diocese of Guanare (erected)
7 June 1954Territory LostDiocese of Calabozo
Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
Territorial Prelature of San Fernando de Apure (erected)
21 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Calabozo
Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Diocese of Maracay (erected)
23 July 1965Territory LostDiocese of Calabozo
Archdiocese of Mérida
Diocese of Barinas (erected)
25 July 1992Territory LostDiocese of Calabozo Diocese of Valle de la Pascua (erected)
Archdiocese of Calabozo
17 June 1995ElevatedDiocese of Calabozo Archdiocese of Calabozo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Calabozo
1950197,000200,00098.5%226287,03581345ap1951
1957208,600213,00097.9%259346,135114637ap1960
1966278,000280,00099.3%3215475,914156030ap1967
1970329,000333,00098.8%473506,58037036ap1971
1976165,000170,00097.1%308384,34287534ap1977
1977395,000400,00098.8%27103710,675107537ap1981
1990491,000525,00093.5%2953414,44177242ap1991
Archdiocese of Calabozo
1999281,285356,37078.9%1772411,7203231821ap2000
2000283,500360,20378.7%1531815,7503172021ap2001
2001288,200363,90079.2%1972611,0845222221ap2002
2002302,610382,09579.2%1672313,1567212224ap2003
2003332,000482,00068.9%2172811,8579252024ap2004
2004500,000540,00092.6%2042420,83310232024ap2005
2006519,000560,00092.7%2332619,9611291524ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013