Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Felipe Díaz Sánchez

Archbishop of Calabozo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1955 BornAraure
14 Jul 197924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Barquisimeto, Venezuela
27 Feb 199741.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
27 Feb 199741.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitifis
24 May 199742.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitifis
4 Apr 200044.9AppointedBishop of Carúpano, Venezuela
10 Dec 200853.6AppointedArchbishop of Calabozo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Manuel Felipe Díaz Sánchez:
Archbishop Manuel Felipe Díaz Sánchez (born ) Archbishop of Calabozo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Calabozo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013