Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cumaná

Archidioecesis Cumanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 May 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 6,152 (2,376 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle Bolivar 34, Apartado 134, Cumana 6101-A, Edo. Sucre, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0293)431.41.31; 431.44.07
  • Fax: 433.34.13

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cumaná
12 October 1922ErectedDiocese of Cumaná (erected)
18 July 1969Territory LostDiocese of Cumaná Diocese of Margarita (erected)
Archdiocese of Cumaná
16 May 1992ElevatedDiocese of Cumaná Archdiocese of Cumaná
4 April 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Cumaná Diocese of Carúpano (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cumaná
1949380,000.0%1514290123521ap1951
1966525,000535,90098.0%3815539,905169135ap1967
1970475,447484,44798.1%2721489,905226031ap1971
1976500,782510,60798.1%26204610,886217035ap1977
1980569,600583,00097.7%35165111,168176939ap1981
1990646,000694,00093.1%34124614,043137055ap1991
Archdiocese of Cumaná
1999781,276822,39695.0%37185514,205197743ap2000
2000306,500319,20896.0%288368,51395923ap2001
2001480,000505,86494.9%24113513,714124124ap2003
2003540,000600,01290.0%25103515,428124524ap2004
2004612,055680,07590.0%23103318,547114523ap2005
2006489,000515,00095.0%1992817,464104724ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Apr 2013