Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Enrique Márquez Gómez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1915Born
14 Jul 194024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cumaná, Venezuela
25 Jun 196347.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
25 Jun 196347.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
25 Aug 196348.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
30 Nov 196651.3AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Venezuela
29 Feb 199276.6RetiredBishop of San Felipe, Venezuela
11 Dec 200489.4DiedBishop Emeritus of San Felipe, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Tomás Enrique Márquez Gómez
Bishop Tomás Enrique Márquez Gómez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Ana del Norte

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018