Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lucas Guillermo Castillo Hernández

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1879BornSan Casimiro
15 Jan 190525.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 192344.3AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
21 Oct 192344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Coro, Venezuela
10 Nov 193960.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
10 Nov 193960.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhizaeum
13 May 194667.2SucceededArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
9 Sep 195576.5DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Lucas Guillermo Castillo Hernández:
Archbishop Lucas Guillermo Castillo Hernández (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015