Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Iturriza Guillén, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coro, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1903Born
28 Aug 192825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Nov 193936.4AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
18 Feb 194036.7Ordained BishopBishop of Coro, Venezuela
20 May 198076.9RetiredBishop of Coro, Venezuela
14 Jan 200399.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Coro, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Iturriza Guillén
Bishop Francisco José Iturriza Guillén S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia

  • a priest for 74.3 years
  • a bishop for 62.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018