Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ciudad Bolívar

Archidioecesis Civitatis Bolivarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 June 1958
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 109,769 (42,398 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 43, Avda. Andres Eloy Blanco c. Avda. Naiguata, Ciudad Bolivar 8001, Edo. Bolivar, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0285)654.49.60
  • Fax: 654.08.21

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Guayana
20 May 1790ErectedDiocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico) Diocese of Guayana (erected)
Diocese of Ciudad Bolívar
2 January 1953Name ChangedDiocese of Guayana Diocese of Ciudad Bolívar
7 June 1954Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Bolívar (Anzoátegui) Diocese of Barcelona (erected)
24 May 1958Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Bolívar (Monagas) Diocese of Maturín (erected)
Archdiocese of Ciudad Bolívar
21 June 1958ElevatedDiocese of Ciudad Bolívar Archdiocese of Ciudad Bolívar
20 August 1979Territory LostArchdiocese of Ciudad Bolívar Diocese of Ciudad Guayana (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Guayana
1950378,000385,00098.2%18123012,60030ap1951
Diocese of Ciudad Bolívar
Archdiocese of Ciudad Bolívar
1966235,800263,00089.7%2221435,483217521ap1967
1970305,000330,00092.4%2226486,354289627ap1971
1976373,000406,66591.7%2328517,3133710834ap1977
1980243,000269,76290.1%1813317,8383145127ap1981
1990300,000320,00093.8%1482213,63697016ap1991
1999380,000405,00093.8%17112813,571116323ap2000
2000460,750475,00097.0%18112915,887117023ap2001
2001487,000500,00097.4%21143513,914147023ap2002
2002487,000500,00097.4%20143414,323146724ap2003
2003490,000503,00097.4%19133215,312136924ap2004
2004500,000516,00096.9%22133514,285136624ap2005
2006547,000570,00096.0%19133217,0932135325ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Apr 2013