Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Medardo Luis Luzardo Romero

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1935Born
6 Jan 196024.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 197237.0AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
25 Jul 197237.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
20 Aug 197944.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Guayana, Venezuela
26 May 198651.1AppointedArchbishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
27 Aug 201176.3RetiredArchbishop of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela
27 Nov 201883.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ciudad Bolívar, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Medardo Luis Luzardo Romero
Archbishop Medardo Luis Luzardo Romero (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ciudad Bolívar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Puertos de Altagracia
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Chiquinquirá, Basilica, Maracaibo, Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Death PlaceLos Puertos de Altagracia

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2011
  • d: CB, 28 Nov 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 25 Mar 2020

Quantcast