Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Maracaibo

Archidioecesis Maracaibensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 April 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 12,319 (4,758 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle 95 entre Avenidas 2 y 3, Apartado 439, Maracaibo 4001, Edo. Zulia, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0261)7225.351; (0412)5470.157

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Zulia
28 July 1897ErectedDiocese of Mérida Diocese of Zulia (erected)
26 May 1943Territory LostDiocese of Zulia (Paez, Perijà, northern part of Mara, and part of Colon) Vicariate Apostolic of Machiques (erected)
Diocese of Maracaibo
2 January 1953Name ChangedDiocese of Zulia Diocese of Maracaibo
23 July 1965Territory LostDiocese of Maracaibo (Miranda, Bolivar, Baralt, and Sucre within Zulia) Diocese of Cabimas (erected)
Archdiocese of Maracaibo
30 April 1966ElevatedDiocese of Maracaibo Archdiocese of Maracaibo
7 July 1994Territory LostDiocese of Cabimas (Sucre)
Archdiocese of Maracaibo (Colón)
Archdiocese of Mérida (Alberto Adriani, Obispo Ramos de Lora, Caracciolo Parra y Olmedo, Tulio Febres Cordero, Justo Briceño, and Julio César Salas)
Diocese of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia (erected)
28 January 1995Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Machiques (Páez and Northern part of Mara along with Gonzalo Antonio) Archdiocese of Maracaibo
28 January 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Maracaibo (Parts of Encontrados and Udón Pérez) Vicariate Apostolic of Machiques

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zulia
1949286,000290,00098.6%2920495,8363415021ap1951
Diocese of Maracaibo
Archdiocese of Maracaibo
1966620,000650,00095.4%44881324,69612031831ap1967
1970760,000800,00095.0%48941425,35214132043ap1971
1976950,0001,100,00086.4%35761118,55810417850ap1977
1980815,000865,00094.2%36841206,7919830051ap1981
19901,415,0001,505,00094.0%458012511,3209229555ap1991
19991,747,0002,083,78583.8%796314212,30249229660ap2000
20001,785,0002,100,00085.0%696113013,73049130060ap2001
20011,785,0002,100,00085.0%726113313,42149130060ap2002
20021,785,0002,100,00085.0%756113613,12549130060ap2003
20031,625,4151,888,00086.1%735512812,69848327366ap2004
20041,863,6902,006,75792.9%715012115,40277127565ap2005
20132,161,0002,329,00092.8%655812317,569207220464ap2014
20162,252,4542,427,82692.8%903112118,615194720868ap2017
20192,340,8002,523,10092.8%852611121,08827339069ap2020
20212,398,4402,585,15092.8%71168727,56812209073ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Maracaibo
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 300, and Page 301
  • Archdiocese of Maracaibo
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 788, and Page 789
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 87, Page 529, and Page 530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 27 Aug 2023