Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edgar Peña Parra

Substitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Thelepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1960 Born
23 Aug 198525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Maracaibo, Venezuela
8 Jan 201150.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
8 Jan 201150.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thelepte
2 Feb 201150.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Pakistan
5 Feb 201150.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thelepte
21 Feb 201554.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mozambique
15 Aug 201858.4AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
15 Oct 201858.6InstalledSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Edgar Peña Parra
Archbishop Edgar Peña Parra (born ) Substitute (Sostituto) of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaibo, Venezuela
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Secretariat of State.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,949
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Aug 2018

Quantcast