Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Pakistan



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Germano Penemote, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 9 October 1951
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Pakistan
  • Mailing Address: G.P.O. Box 1106, 5th Street, Diplomatic Enclave N. 1, Islamabad 44000, Pakistan
  • Telephone: (92-51)2278.217/8
  • Fax: 2820.847

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Pakistan
17 July 1950EstablishedDelegation to Pakistan
Nunciature to Pakistan
9 October 1951ElevatedDelegation to Pakistan Nunciature to Pakistan (to Internunciature)
27 December 1965ElevatedNunciature to Pakistan (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Pakistan
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 42, Page 878, and Page 879
  • Nunciature to Pakistan
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 712, and Page 713
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.8, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Jul 2024