Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emanuele Gerada

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Nomentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1920BornZejtun, Malta
1 Aug 194323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
15 Feb 196746.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nomentum
15 Feb 196746.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
18 Jun 196747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nomentum
6 Apr 196847.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malta
8 Nov 197353.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nomentum
8 Nov 197353.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
8 Nov 197353.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
15 Oct 198060.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
4 Feb 198968.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
17 Oct 199575.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
21 Jan 201190.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ireland

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Gerada:
Archbishop Emanuele Gerada (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Ireland

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Sep 2014