Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Anthony Frendo, O.P.

Archbishop of Tiranė-Durrės


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1946 BornQormi, Malta
1967²20.7Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Apr 196923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Jul 200660.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tiranė-Durrės, Albania
7 Jul 200660.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Buthrotum
23 Sep 200660.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buthrotum
17 Nov 201670.6AppointedArchbishop of Tiranė-Durrės, Albania
3 Dec 201670.6InstalledArchbishop of Tiranė-Durrės, Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Anthony Frendo (VIAF: 88921823)
Archbishop George Anthony Frendo O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Tiranė-Durrės

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tiranė-Durrės.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,247
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2016
  • i: CB, 17 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Nov 2016