Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Mercieca

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1928BornVictoria
8 Mar 195223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gozo, Malta
20 Jul 197445.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
20 Jul 197445.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
29 Sep 197445.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
29 Nov 197648.0AppointedArchbishop of Malta
2 Dec 200678.0RetiredArchbishop of Malta
21 Mar 201687.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Malta

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mercieca
Archbishop Joseph Mercieca (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Malta

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2006
  • opd/c1/d: CB, 21 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016