Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaello Funghini

Deceased

Dean Emeritus of the Roman Rota

Titular Archbishop of Nova Petra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1929BornCastiglion Fiorentino
13 Jul 195223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Arezzo, Italy
11 Dec 199970.9AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
31 Jan 200475.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nova Petra
31 Jan 200475.1RetiredDean of the Roman Rota
25 Mar 200475.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nova Petra
17 May 200677.4DiedDean Emeritus of the Roman Rota

MicroData Summary for Raffaello Funghini:
Archbishop Raffaello Funghini (born , died ) Dean Emeritus of Roman Rota

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,553
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013