Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Camilleri

Apostolic Nuncio to Ethiopia

Titular Archbishop of Skálholt

Apostolic Nuncio to Djibouti

Apostolic Delegate to Somalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1965 Born
5 Jul 199125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
3 Sep 201954.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
3 Sep 201954.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Skálholt
4 Oct 201954.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Skálholt
31 Oct 201954.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ethiopia
31 Oct 201954.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Djibouti
31 Oct 201954.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia

MicroData Summary for Antoine Camilleri (VIAF: 301793393)
Archbishop Antoine Camilleri (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Ethiopia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSliema, Archdiocese of Malta
Ordained PriestMalta, Archdiocese of Malta
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Ethiopia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Sep 2019
  • c34: CB, 4 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,251
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 1 Nov 2019

Quantcast