Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Quarracino

Deceased

Archbishop of Buenos Aires

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle

Bishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1923BornPollica di Salerno, Italy
22 Dec 194522.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
3 Feb 196238.4AppointedBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
8 Apr 196238.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
3 Aug 196844.9AppointedBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
5 Oct 196845.1InstalledBishop of Avellaneda, Argentina
18 Dec 198562.3AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
5 Apr 198662.6InstalledArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
10 Jul 199066.9AppointedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Oct 199067.2AppointedBishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
22 Nov 199067.2InstalledArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 Jun 199167.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199167.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Salute a Primavalle
28 Feb 199874.5DiedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Quarracino:
Antonio Cardinal Quarracino (born , died ) Archbishop of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
  • a cardinal for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015