Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Omar Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of San Martín, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1938Born
3 Dec 196628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 May 199253.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 May 199253.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Enera
27 Jun 199253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Enera
22 Feb 200061.5AppointedBishop of San Martín, Argentina
1 May 200061.7InstalledBishop of San Martín, Argentina
2 Feb 200364.4DiedBishop of San Martín, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Raúl Omar Rossi
Bishop Raúl Omar Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of San Martín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGualeguaychú
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,783
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • c34: CB, 2 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast