Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Carlos Maletti

Bishop of Merlo-Moreno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1949 BornBuenos Aires
24 Nov 197324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Jul 200152.3AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina
18 Sep 200152.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina
22 Sep 200152.5InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Bariloche, Argentina
6 May 201364.1AppointedBishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
9 Jun 201364.2InstalledBishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Fernando Carlos Maletti:
Bishop Fernando Carlos Maletti (born ) Bishop of Merlo-Moreno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Merlo-Moreno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,050
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2013
  • i: CB, 21 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 5 Sep 2013