Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Eduardo Miñarro

Auxiliary Bishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Antium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1960 Born
22 Oct 199434.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Morón, Argentina
25 Mar 199534.5Ordained PriestPriest of Morón, Argentina
13 May 199736.6IncardinatedPriest of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
19 Sep 201656.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
19 Sep 201656.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Antium
3 Dec 201656.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antium

MicroData Summary for Oscar Eduardo Miñarro
Bishop Oscar Eduardo Miñarro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Merlo-Moreno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained Deaconla Inmaculada Concepción del Buen Viaje, Cathedral, Diocese of Morón
Ordained Bishopin front of Nuestra Señora del Rosario, Cathedral, Moreno, Diocese of Merlo-Moreno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Merlo-Moreno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2016
  • od/c01: CB, 16 Sep 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Sep 2016
  • c2+: CB, 2 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast