Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Olivera

Bishop of Argentina, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1959 Born
18 Sep 198425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Morón, Argentina
24 Jun 200849.4AppointedBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
18 Aug 200849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
28 Mar 201758.2AppointedBishop of Argentina, Military
30 Jun 201758.4InstalledBishop of Argentina, Military

MicroData Summary for Santiago Olivera (VIAF: 14438111)
Bishop Santiago Olivera (born ) Bishop of Argentina, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Argentina, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,949
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2017
  • i: CB, 20 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 7 Oct 2017