Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Giustiniani

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1769Born
21 Dec 181646.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 181747.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
14 Apr 181747.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
20 Apr 181747.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
13 Mar 182656.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
2 Oct 182656.7Elevated to Cardinal
2 Oct 182656.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
16 Dec 183262.9ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
21 Nov 183464.8AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
1 Jul 183767.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
2 Oct 183767.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
22 Nov 183969.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
24 Feb 184373.1DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Giustiniani (VIAF: 89061009)
Giacomo Cardinal Giustiniani (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 7
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 223, and Page 382
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1826
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 235, and Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast