Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Artico

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1798BornCeneda
7 Apr 182123.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 184042.4SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
14 Dec 184042.8ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
27 Dec 184042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
21 Dec 185961.8DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Artico (VIAF: 89016453)
Bishop Filippo Artico (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1840, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016