Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maria Cardelli, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

Titular Archbishop of Achrida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1777BornRoma, Italy
26 Jun 181739.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
18 Mar 181840.5AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
29 Jun 181840.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
29 Aug 183255.0ResignedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
11 Sep 183255.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
11 Jun 186890.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Cardelli
Archbishop Luigi Maria Cardelli O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 58, and Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016