Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1794Born
10 May 182935.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chios (Scio), Greece
10 May 182935.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
8 Sep 182935.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
15 Mar 183036.1AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
10 Mar 187581.1DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Giustiniani
Bishop Ignazio Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios

  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 60, and Page 149
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018