Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Dracopoli

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1766¹Born
19 Dec 181448.9AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
18 Jun 181549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
1 Aug 182155.5DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Dracopoli
Bishop Francesco Saverio Dracopoli (born 1766, died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018