Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca de Cigalla

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1828AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
12 Jul 1829Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
27 Jul 1832AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
27 Jul 1832AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
12 Feb 1847DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Luca de Cigalla
Bishop Luca de Cigalla (died ) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 171, and Page 333
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018