Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Mincione

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1805BornMacerata Campania
20 Sep 182822.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 184741.1SelectedBishop of Mileto, Italy
12 Apr 184741.4ConfirmedBishop of Mileto, Italy
18 Apr 184741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
29 Apr 188276.4DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Mincione
Bishop Filippo Mincione (born , died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Dec 2016