Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo de Caprio

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1812Born
20 Dec 183422.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 183522.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 187663.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mileto, Italy
3 Apr 187663.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
3 Dec 187664.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
13 Dec 188068.0AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
14 Dec 188775.0DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo de Caprio
Bishop Carlo de Caprio (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasanova, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mileto, Diocese of Mileto

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,223
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178, and Page 383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018