Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Vaccari, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1817Born
22 Aug 184124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Dec 187154.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
22 Dec 187154.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
31 Dec 187154.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
16 Dec 188770.6DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Vaccari (VIAF: 89521118)
Bishop Luigi Vaccari O.S.B. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuscaldo, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Ordained BishopSant'Apollinare, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 414, and Page 520
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,738
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017