Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Menchi

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1789BornFirenze
9 Oct 181425.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 183950.9AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
29 Dec 183950.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
30 Jan 184354.0AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
22 May 184657.3DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Menchi
Bishop Vincenzo Menchi (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1839, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Oct 2016