Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Orlandi

Deceased

Bishop of Pontremoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1793Born
14 Aug 182026.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 183946.2AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
29 Dec 183946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
9 Nov 187481.1DiedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Orlandi
Bishop Michelangelo Orlandi (born , died ) Bishop of Pontremoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocca Sigillina

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,839, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast