Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ranza

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1801Born
15 Mar 182322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 182322.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 184948.2AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
20 May 184948.3Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
20 Nov 187574.8DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ranza (VIAF: 160565575)
Bishop Antonio Ranza (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017