Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Buscarini

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1819Born
21 May 184223.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Jun 184324.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187152.5AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
28 Jan 187252.7Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
9 Sep 187253.3DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Buscarini (VIAF: 304922107)
Bishop Giuseppe Buscarini (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeli di Coli, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Borgo San Donnino, Diocese of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017