Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geremia Bonomelli

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1831Born
2 Jun 185523.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 187140.0AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
26 Nov 187140.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
3 Aug 191482.8DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Geremia Bonomelli (VIAF: 73903530)
Bishop Geremia Bonomelli (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNigoline, Diocese of Brescia
Ordained BishopBrescia, Diocese of Brescia

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017