Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Valsecchi

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Bergamo, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1809Born
16 Jun 183222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
25 Jun 186959.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
25 Jun 186959.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
11 Jul 186959.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
22 Dec 187162.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
6 May 187969.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Valsecchi (VIAF: 89522715)
Bishop Alessandro Valsecchi (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147, and Page 552
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017