Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Bersani-Dossena

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Lodi, Italy

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1835Born
19 Sep 185722.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lodi, Italy
31 Mar 187539.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lodi, Italy
31 Mar 187539.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
11 Apr 187539.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara
12 Jun 188752.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Bersani-Dossena (VIAF: 88685916)
Bishop Angelo Bersani-Dossena (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaullo Lodigiano, Diocese of Lodi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lodi, Diocese of Lodi

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335, and Page 443
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017