Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Giuseppe Nazari di Calabiana

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1808Born
29 May 183122.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 184738.6SelectedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
12 Apr 184738.7ConfirmedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
6 Jun 184738.8Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
27 Mar 186758.6AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
23 Jun 186758.9InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
23 Oct 189385.2DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Giuseppe Nazari di Calabiana (VIAF: 34562021)
Archbishop Luigi Giuseppe Nazari di Calabiana (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavigliano, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Groppello d'Adda Cemetery, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 187, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 21
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017