Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Guglielmo Maria Renaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Pinerolo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1808Born
7 Apr 183223.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 184839.5SelectedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
11 Dec 184839.9ConfirmedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
20 May 184940.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
10 Jun 184940.4InstalledBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
23 Jul 187364.5DiedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Guglielmo Maria Renaldi (VIAF: 89508325)
Bishop Lorenzo Guglielmo Maria Renaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Pinerolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017