Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Ottaviano Riccardi di Netro

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1808BornBiella
16 Jun 183224.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 184133.5SelectedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
24 Jan 184233.6ConfirmedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
20 Feb 184233.7Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
22 Feb 186758.7AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
16 Oct 187062.3DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Ottaviano Riccardi di Netro (VIAF: 89353678)
Archbishop Alessandro Ottaviano Riccardi di Netro (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 538
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1842, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016