Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Bede Polding, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sydney


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1794BornLiverpool, Great Britain
4 Mar 181924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Jul 183237.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land, Australia
3 Jul 183237.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
29 Jun 183439.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
5 Apr 184247.5AppointedBishop of Sydney, Australia
22 Apr 184247.5AppointedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
16 Mar 187782.4DiedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Bede Polding:
Archbishop John Bede Polding O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sydney

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 214, and Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013