Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1795Born
1824²28.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1825²29.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 184246.9AppointedBishop of Adelaide, Australia
8 Sep 184449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Adelaide, Australia
26 Apr 185862.9DiedBishop of Adelaide, Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Murphy (VIAF: 7132844)
Bishop Francis Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavan, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney
Death PlaceDiocese of Adelaide
Buried Place (Original)St. Francis Xavier (unfinished), Cathedral, Adelaide, Diocese of Adelaide

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 59
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 2 Dec 2020

Quantcast