Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert William Willson (Wilson)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hobart

Titular Bishop of Rhodiapolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1794BornLincoln, Great Britain
16 Dec 182430.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 184247.3AppointedBishop of Hobart, Australia
28 Oct 184247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hobart, Australia
11 May 184449.4InstalledBishop of Hobart, Australia
21 Jan 186671.1ResignedBishop of Hobart, Australia
16 Feb 186671.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
30 Jun 186671.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Robert William Willson (Wilson) (VIAF: 94593237)
Bishop Robert William Willson (Wilson) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hobart

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 482
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Nov 2016